TAVISTOCK MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a museum to educate and inform the public of Tavistock and direct and display, store and conserve artefacts, photographs and documents pertaining to its heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 09 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Holliday | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Roderick Malcolm John Martin | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony William Rose | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin Dickens | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rose | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Savage | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHAEOLOGICAL, RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL, CULTURAL INDUSTRIAL AND HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE TOWN OF TAVISTOCK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY AND ITS RELATION TO THE WIDER HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE UK AND SOUTH-WEST ENGLAND, BY THE SETTING UP AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND COMMUNITY HERITAGE CENTRE WHICH PROVIDES A DIVERSE PROGRAMME OF EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS AND OUTREACH EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAVISTOCK MUSEUM
COURT GATE
BEDFORD SQUARE
TAVISTOCK
PL19 0AE
- Phone:
- 07802372594
- Email:
- tonywrose@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window