UK HEALTH ALLIANCE ON CLIMATE CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We preserve and protect the health of people by bringing together health professionals to advocate for just responses to the climate and ecological crisis. We promote the health benefits that flow from these changes and empower health professionals to make changes in their professional and personal lives to advocate for just responses to the climate and ecological crises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 20 October 2022: CIO registration
- UKHACC (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Smith CBE | Chair | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Banks | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jill Janette Freda Belch OBE | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Richard Morton | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Radcliffe MRCGP | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ranee Thakar MD FRCOG | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Sandra Mather MSc, PhD | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Roaf FFPH | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacob Krzanowski | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Gallagher | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Dobson MA | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ENABLING AND SUPPORTING HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND HEALTH BODIES TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH IN THE FACE OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND RELATED ISSUES; AND (B) SUPPORTING STRATEGIES AND METHODS OF REDUCTION, MITIGATION AND ADAPTATION IN RESPONSE TO CLIMATE CHANGE WHICH IMPROVE PUBLIC HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UK HEALTH ALLIANCE ON CLIMATE CHANG
BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL
B M A HOUSE
TAVISTOCK SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 9JR
- Phone:
- 02071111105
- Email:
- info@ukhealthalliance.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window