WHIXLEY VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a village hall for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Whixley and surrounding areas without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, age, disability, nationality, race or political, religious or other opinions in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 August 2022: CIO registration
- 10 May 2023: Funds received from 523992 THE WHIXLEY VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Scales | Chair | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Bowers | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Manley | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian McNeill | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Turner | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Tolan | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.15k | £138.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.99k | £131.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £300 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.96k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WHIXLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS (?AREA OF BENEFIT?) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whixley Village Hall
Franks Lane
Whixley
YORK
YO26 8AP
- Phone:
- 0330 403 7880
- Email:
- chair@whixleyvillagehall.org
- Website:
-
whixleyvillagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window