RIGHT TO RESIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a Deterrent proof and alert mobile phone App to victims of crime.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £1,892 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 2022: CIO registration
- R2R (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Anne Speir | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Phoebe Gibson | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
LADY ANNA MARGARET BLACKETT | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED SHALL BE TO: A. PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION AND DETECTION OF CRIME B. THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME. C. THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE ON CRIME PREVENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST DEANRAW
LANGLEY-ON-TYNE
HEXHAM
NE47 5LY
- Phone:
- 07713157650
- Email:
- belinda@babates.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window