BARLBOROUGH MINERS WELFARE RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community organisation which aims to support the residents of the local area in the activities of recreation, including a number of societys and a number of different dance groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 26 May 1965: Standard registration
- BARLBOROUGH MINERS AND WELFARE RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRANT WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.08k | £41.89k | £43.08k | £76.30k | £97.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.63k | £30.21k | £35.99k | £75.17k | £95.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.67k | £20.98k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1923, 4 NOVEMBER 1926, 22 SEPTEMBER 1953 AND 26 AUGUST 1963
Charitable objects
(A) AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND OR PLEASURE GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN OR ABOUT THE COALMINES IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA (C) AND (D) AN INSTITUTE FOR THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE HEALTH, SOCIAL WELL-BEING AND CONDITIONS OF LIVING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BARLBOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
KARICKEN HOUSE
LOCKO ROAD
LOWER PILSLEY
CHESTERFIELD
S45 8DN
- Phone:
- 01246810398
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window