THE BLACKWELL MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND SCHEME

Charity number: 520415
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity provides support and faclities for all members of the community. The Welfare proves a range of social and sporting facilites for Blackwell and the surounding villages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008

Total income: £5,088
Total expenditure: £13,685

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1968: Standard registration
  • 17 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 17 January 2020: Funds transferred to 520416 HILCOTE MINERS WELFARE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
  • 17 January 2020: Funds transferred to 520416 HILCOTE MINERS WELFARE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BLACKWELL MINERS WELFARE (Working name)
  • BLACKWELL "A" WINNING INSTITUTE, BRIGADE HALL AND SPORTS GROUND SCHEME (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £3.09k £14.71k £4.41k £4.75k £5.09k
Total expenditure £17.63k £31.21k £3.92k £8.56k £13.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted