THE SORN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sorn Foundation is a non-profit charity organization that provides educational support to women and children living in rural Cambodia. The foundation was established with the mission of breaking the cycle of poverty and inequality by educating children and women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambodia
Governance
- 07 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Clements BSc BA | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jowsey | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hearne | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN LIVING IN RURAL CAMBODIA BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES, KHMER AND ENGLISH EDUCATION PACKAGES, BASIC SKILLS, HEALTHY RELATIONSHIP WORKSHOPS, SEXUAL HEALTH SESSIONS AND WOMEN'S RIGHTS AND PARENTING; AND 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUSTAINABLE LIVING PROGRAMMES (SLP) GROWING VEGETABLES AND RAISING LIVESTOCK, WHICH INCLUDES PROVIDING BABY CHICKS AND DUCKS TO RAISE AND ALL REQUIRED MATERIALS INCLUDING CAGES AND FEED AND VEGETABLE SEEDS AND SAPS TO GROW. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Manor Park
Manor Avenue
Urmston
MANCHESTER
M41 9HH
- Phone:
- 07874877139
- Email:
- info@thesornfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window