TAVISTOCK MONTESSORI PRE-SCHOOL C.I.O

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charity Montessori Pre-school that is currently operating in Tavistock where St Peters School is located, we provide learning for 2-5 years old following the Early Years Curriculum with Montessori ways helping them prepare for primary school and life, this is a more independent way of learning and is proven to help with self confidence and esteem which benefits the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £46,041 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 September 2022: CIO registration
- 11 December 2023: Funds received from 281394 THE WHITCHURCH MONTESSORI GROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Credicott | Chair | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Peachey | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Ruskin | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Greeley | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Haley Shaw | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hodge | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Credicott | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.18k | £57.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.25k | £62.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.95k | £46.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2022 as amended on 12 Jun 2023 as amended on 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Junior School
School Close
Greenlands
TAVISTOCK
PL19 9HW
- Phone:
- 01822613927
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window