THE RIDGEWOOD VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ridgewood Village Hall hosts a diverse range of community groups serving Ridgewood and the surrounding area, run by a committee of volunteers/trustees who run the day to day operations of the hall but also provide community fundraising events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £7,273 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 11 August 2022: CIO registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 289627 THE RIDGEWOOD VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Bedwell | Chair | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Christopher Ridley | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Elaine BROOK | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET DAVEY | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosina Reed | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Metcalfe | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN NOBLE | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Janine Williams | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sally Davis | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Love | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Smith | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.91k | £51.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.35k | £42.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF RIDGEWOOD AND ITS ENVIRONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGION AND OTHER OPINIONS BY BUILDING AND MAINTAINING A PAVILION ON THE RIDGEWOOD RECREATION GROUND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ridgewood Village Hall
New Road
Ridgewood
Uckfield
East Sussex
TN22 5TG
- Phone:
- 07951316484
- Website:
-
ridgewoodvillagehall.wixsite.com/uckfield
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window