BRAILSFORD AND EDNASTON INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall - the management committee run it for the benefit of people of all ages living in the parish. It is also used by people outside the parish when available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 August 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Margaret Minshall | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Kurpios | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Howarth | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Elliott | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lorking | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.48k | £21.14k | £23.85k | £30.51k | £19.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.58k | £13.88k | £11.13k | £26.39k | £14.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION DATED 2 JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
BRAILSFORD AND EDNASTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brailsford & Ednaston Institute
Main Road
Brailsford
ASHBOURNE
Derbyshire
DE6 3DA
- Phone:
- 01335 360992
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window