CASTLETON PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage the playing field and children's play area. We raise money and involve village residents in fund raising and social events. Local businesses support our work financially and we have an effective working relationship with them and our Parish Council. Castleton Primary School now use a dedicated woodland area for environmental studies. The field is open to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 23 August 1963: Standard registration
- CASTLETON PLAYING FIELDS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- CASTLETON PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
- CASTLETON RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hayes | Chair |
|
||||||
Paul Vincent Hatt | Trustee | 10 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Tonkins | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Steven Newberry | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynn Trainor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brian Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.95k | £240 | £5.22k | £5.46k | £6.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.86k | £1.49k | £6.39k | £1.44k | £6.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 MARCH 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CASTLETON (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT"), WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CASTLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Weaving Avenue
Castleton
HOPE VALLEY
Derbyshire
S33 8WZ
- Phone:
- 07746287606
- Email:
- info@fixitsteve.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window