SIGN ALONG WITH US FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief and assistance of people with complex medical needs who are registered disabled throughout England, Scotland, Wales and Northern Ireland by providing them with respite accommodation which is inclusive and accessible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 October 2022: CIO registration
- SAWU FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jade Summer Kilduff BCAc | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Kilduff | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Colin McGrath | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WITH COMPLEX MEDICAL NEEDS WHO ARE REGISTERED DISABLED THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, SCOTLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND BY PROVIDING THEM WITH RESPITE ACCOMMODATION WHICH IS INCLUSIVE AND ACCESSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 PINFOLD AVENUE
MANCHESTER
M9 7DW
- Phone:
- 07939942404
- Email:
- admin@sawufoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window