LEICESTERSHIRE CONGOLESE MUTUAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We address the issues of isolation, lack of information, and loneliness experienced by migrants, refugees and their families, with particular emphasis on those facing health and immigration issues. We seeks to strengthen community relations by uniting individuals and offering key information, guidance, and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 December 2022: CIO registration
- LEICESTERSHIRE CONGOLEESE MUTUAL GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rose Ntumba Panumudipo | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tchimissa Bagalwa | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lenga Difumba | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Diame Lutwamuzire | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Nasha Mateko Luyindula | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MIGRANTS, REFUGEES, CONGOLESE PEOPLE AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN LEICESTERSHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SERVICES OF INTERPRETING, TRANSLATING, ADVOCACY, HEALTH/HOUSING ADVICE EMPLOYMENT ADVICE AND IT SKILLS TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EPWORTH METHODIST CHURCH
BLACKBIRD ROAD
LEICESTER
LE4 0FW
- Phone:
- 07456928699
- Email:
- lcmg.hope@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window