GRESLEY OLD HALL COMMUNITY WELFARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a community centre and a youth centre and other facilities for recreation and other leisure-time occupation for the benefit of the inhabitants (and in particular, but not exclusively, such of the said inhabitants as are members of the mining community) of the area of benefit without distinction of political, religious or other opinions with the object of improving their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 April 1965: Standard registration
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE NO 1 MINERS WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE NO 1 MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE NO 1 MINERS'WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Anthony Lycett | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Ferguson - Eyre | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Blackman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Bailey | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Blackman | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Martyn Winfield | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROY DOUGLAS HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.87k | £111.52k | £107.08k | £134.64k | £159.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.93k | £123.27k | £133.23k | £147.74k | £158.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND YOUTH CENTRE AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gresley Old Hall
Gresley Wood Road
Church Gresley
Swadlincote
DE11 9QW
- Phone:
- 01283551193
- Email:
- GOHCWC@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window