NEW LIFE ROEHAMPTON

Charity Number: 1201162
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A church serving the Alton Estate Roehampton, running church services and providing pastoral support to anyone in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £23,401
Total expenditure: £25,196

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 2022: CIO registration
  • 01 May 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 01 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1193046 HOPE CHURCH VAUXHALL
  • 01 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1147543 THE BRIDGE BATTERSEA
  • 01 May 2025: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.40k
Total expenditure £25.20k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window