SADDLEWORTH SPIRITUALIST NATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the church are to advance the religion and religious philosophy of spiritualism on the basis of the seven principles of spiritualism Its activities including holding regular services which are open to the public The church also provides sessions in mediumship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 August 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Maria Jones | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Roby | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Ernest Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzannah Ewing | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pywell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Longmate | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 April 2025 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SADDLEWORTH SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
161 HIGH STREET
UPPERMILL
Oldham
OL3 6BD
- Phone:
- 01279816363
- Email:
- snu@snu.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window