THE STURGEON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1203033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sturgeon Foundation seeks to advance education in Central Asia, South Asia, the Middle East, and Eastern Europe principally through awarding university scholarships and training opportunities to students seeking careers in finance and technology.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,877
Total expenditure: £19,680

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Bangladesh
  • Egypt
  • Georgia
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Pakistan
  • Uzbekistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Graham Chair 11 May 2023
None on record
Gulnara Yunusova Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Aziza Zakhidova Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Kiyan Zandiyeh Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Robin Butler Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Glenn Svensson Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.88k
Total expenditure £19.68k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1a BRITANNIA STREET
LONDON
WC1X 9JT
Phone:
02071268178