COVENTRY WEST AFRICAN COMMUNITY (CWAC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support services that help socially excluded individuals and deprived communities to become independent and integrated into society. our services include: providing training and development providing temporary financial help providing counselling & support service making grant food distribution to the needy providing references to support their job applications and the others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 August 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lacine Fofana | Chair | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alioune Coulibaly | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mamadou Cherif | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Sesay | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harun Osman Omar | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheikh Bamba | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aboubacar Camara | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Osman Dukuly | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.95k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.89k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE OBJECT/PURPOSE 'TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES AND THE OTHERS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS) FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 WAPPENBURY CLOSE
COVENTRY
CV2 1HA
- Phone:
- 07546944753
- Email:
- westafricmty2020@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window