CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST HOUSE OF GRACE PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith through the belief in one true God, who lives eternally in three persons the Father, the Son and the Holy Spirit; To relate to one another as members of the one Body of Christ throughout the country/world; To Foster evangelism through the preaching of the Gospel with signs and wonders and the demonstration of the gifts of the Holy Spirit by presenting Jesus Christ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 September 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sup Evang Akinseye IYUN | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian CALLISTO | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alimot IYUN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abolaji AWOSANYA | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPLE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO CELESTIAL CHURCH PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22-24 HIGH STREET
GRAYS
RM17 6LU
- Phone:
- 07949292568
- Email:
- houseofgrace1947@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window