Financial history FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 520453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.42k £16.57k £11.59k £14.55k £17.50k
Total expenditure £9.55k £11.59k £17.13k £11.82k £15.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A