PARENTING FOR LIFELONG HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Organisation facilitates the design, delivery, and scale-up of evidence-based, freely available parenting solutions to promote healthy child development and wellbeing, and prevent family violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,652,068
Donations and legacies | £1.65m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£974,856
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £974.86k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £974.86k | |
Retained for future use | £677.21k |
People

10 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Botswana
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Czech Republic
- El Salvador
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Montenegro
- Namibia
- Philippines
- Romania
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 September 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Lucie Dale Cluver | Chair | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Hoffmann | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bahbak Miremadi | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bernadette J Madrid | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65m | |
|
Total expenditure | £974.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.65m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £974.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £957.87k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £74.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 2022
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT BY THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN'S RIGHTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (C) RELIEVING THE NEED FOR VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE, (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES, (E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS, (F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW, (G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION, (H) RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES, (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, (J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS, (K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, AND (I) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT (CLAUSE 4.1.1) BUT NOT OTHERWISE, TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT THE OBJECTS. 4.1.2 THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS IN NEED AND PARENTS IN NEED; 4.2.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS IN NEED THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDINGS IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE; 4.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PARENTS AND CAREGIVERS OF CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF PARENTING SKILLS AND CHILDREN'S RIGHTS; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ONLINE AND IN-PERSON RESOURCES, AND BY PROVIDING TRAINING, CONSULTANCY, MONITORING AND EVALUATION SERVICES TO ORGANISATIONS THAT SUPPORT PARENTS. 4.2 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 4: 4.2.1 "CHILDREN" MEANS PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO HAVE YET TO ATTAIN THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN YEARS. "CHILD" SHALL BE CONSTRUCTED ACCORDINGLY. 4.2.2 "ADOLESCENTS" MEANS PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE BETWEEN THE AGES OF TEN YEARS AND HAVE YET TO ATTAIN THE AGE OF TWENTY YEARS." "ADOLESCENT" SHALL BE CONSTRUCTED ACCORDINGLY. 4.2.3 "CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS IN NEED" MEANS CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, FAMILY CONFLICT OR VIOLENCE OR RISK OF FAMILY CONFLICT OR VIOLENCE OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4.2.4 "CHILDREN'S RIGHTS" MEANS THE RIGHTS OF CHILDREN AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AS ENTERED INTO FORCE BY THE UNITED NATIONS GENERAL ASSEMBLY ON 2 SEPTEMBER 1990 (OR AS AMENDED OR RE-ENACTED FROM TIME TO TIME). 4.2.5 "PARENT" MEANS ANY PERSON WHO HAS PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY FOR A CHILD OR ADOLESCENT OR PROVIDES CARE FOR A CHILD OR ADOLESCENT REGARDLESS OF BIOLOGICAL RELATIONSHIP. "PARENTS" SHALL BE CONSTRUCTED ACCORDINGLY. 4.2.6 "PARENT IN NEED" MEANS PARENTS WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4.2.7 "PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY" MEANS THE PERSON(S) WHO ASSUME ALL THE RIGHTS, DUTIES, POWERS, RESPONSIBILITIES AND AUTHORITY THAT A PARENT OF A CHILD OR ADOLESCENT HAS BY LAW. 4.2.8 "PARENTING SKILLS" MEANS THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, AND SKILLS OF BEING A PARENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
DEP OF SOCIAL POLICY & INTERVENTION
BARNETT HOUSE
32-36 WELLINGTON SQUARE
OXFORD
OX1 2ER
- Phone:
- 07599407051
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window