TLC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TLC Foundation was created by a compassionate group of professional people who recognised the issues faced by a very lovely young girl of 17 years old (K) who is Dual Diagnosis Downs Syndrome and Autism, with severe and complex learning difficulty. From following her journey from a young child to teenager, inevitably we also learned of the issues faced by her friends and siblings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Place | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Thorpe | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Read | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.89k | £20.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.73k | £25.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH SEVERE AND COMPLEX PHYSICAL AND LEARNING DISABILITIES AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN WARWICKSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
The Loft
60 George Street Ringway
BEDWORTH
- Phone:
- 07857 886288
- Email:
- info@tlcfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window