COMMUNITY OF AFRICAN VETERAN ASSOCIATION LEICESTER (CAVAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 February 2023: CIO registration
- CAMEROON VETERAN ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GEORGE CHI TANGYIE PHD, MRSC | Chair |
|
||||||
Junior Elimbi | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elvis Nyiawung Morfaw | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mbi Gerald Baiye | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2025 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2025 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE AGED OVER 25 LIVING IN LEICESTER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING PHYSICAL FITNESS SESSIONS INCLUDING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 GLENGARRY CLOSE
LEICESTER
LE3 6RP
- Phone:
- 07868608333
- Email:
- cgeorge1618@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window