Financial history LEEKE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 520467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.36k £2.89k £7.41k £6.39k £13.85k
Total expenditure £20.21k £3.50k £10.44k £11.72k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A