LITTLEOVER GRANGE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Community Hall which accommodates a variety of clubs and associations including; Derby Sketching Club, Derby Ramblers Association, Derby and District Fuchsia Society, International Friendship League, Littleover Historical Society, Cabaret Theatre Dance, Slimming World. We also accommodate various individual groups. Also hosting our own Horticultural Show and Littleover in Bloom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 08 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANETTE EVELYN JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN EAGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGIA LESLEY CUNNIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER AULT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM BRITLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.62k | £15.35k | £15.29k | £14.80k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.28k | £11.69k | £12.23k | £15.11k | £22.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1012 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1012 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LITTLEOVER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Manor Road
Derby
DE23 6BR
- Phone:
- 01332766288
- Email:
- jan.dante@virgin.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window