JESUS CHRIST INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES OF ST HELENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jesus Christ International Ministries of St Helens is a non denominational Bible based Church. Our desire is to bring people to the Kingdom of the living God regardless of race, nationality and religious affiliation, through saving and delivering knowledge of the Lord Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- St Helens
Governance
- 06 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Donsol | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruel Capucao | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ST HELENS AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF FAITH ATTACHED AT APPENDIX 1 TO THIS CONSTITUTION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Watery Lane
St.Helens
WA9 3HA
- Phone:
- 07722502843
- Email:
- roscastaneda@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window