CROMFORD STEAM RALLY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise heritage events that promote and advance our charitable purposes. We aim to educate the public, especially young people, in all aspects of heritage vehicles, methods and preservation. Amongst several hundred displays and exhibits are Steam engines, motor vehicles, combustion engines and general historic re-enactments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN MELLOR | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WHITTLE | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WRIGHT | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 MAR 2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF THE MANUFACTURE, HISTORY, USE AND CONSERVATION OF ALL TYPES OF VINTAGE STEAM DRIVEN ENGINES AND VINTAGE VEHICLES OF EVERY KIND AND (2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 GALLERY LANE
HOLYMOORSIDE
CHESTERFIELD
S42 7ES
- Phone:
- 07814566442
- Email:
- adamwhittle98@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window