JESUS CHRIST INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES OF DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jesus Christ International Ministries of Derby (JCIM - Derby) operates in Derby. It supports the main branch JCIM Liverpool, JCIM Whiston St. Helens and the other three JCIM churches in the Philippines. We do give donations to the sick, poor and needy and famine relief. Our activities are to reach out to people and preach the good news, as our main purpose is to bring people to the kingdom of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary June Manzano | Chair | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lazaro Fadri | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN DERBY AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF FAITH ATTACHED AT APPENDIX 1 TO THIS CONSTITUTION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilkins Centre Vineyard Church
Becket Street
Derby
DE1 1HT
- Phone:
- 07447927914
- Email:
- junjayjin@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window