THE HOSPITALS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST NICHOLAS, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1201351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the charity is to provide affordable residential accommodation for elderly people in need who have a link with Canterbury. The charity provides independent flats or cottages occupied at low rents. The accommodation is provided at St John's Hospital, Northgate, Canterbury (31 places), the other at St Nicholas' Hospital, Harbledown, Canterbury (10 places).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 2022: CIO registration
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206367 SAINT JOHN'S HOSPITAL
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206366-4 RALPH SNOW
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206366-3 LEGACY OF WILLIAM COLTHUP
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206366-2 ETHEL COLTHUP MEMORIAL FUND
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206366-1 JANE AUSTEN CHARITY
  • 24 May 2024: Funds received from 206366 SAINT NICHOLAS'S HOSPITAL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Michael Whitely Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Emma Salvatore Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
David Stuart Boshier Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Janet Mary Loveless Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Michael James Gwynne Fletcher Trustee 29 April 2024
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW TANGIER
Recently registered
Colonel Jane Carey-Harris TD DL VR Trustee 15 December 2022
THE COMPANY OF NURSES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Antony Richard Amlot Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
VERY REVD DR MICHAEL JOHN CHANDLER Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Dr RICHARD MICHAEL CULLEN Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
JOHN FREDERICK COTTERILL Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Dr JONATHAN MARTIN POTTER Trustee 13 November 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.28m
Total expenditure £710.13k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.56m
Income - Other trading activities £0
Income - Charitable activities £205.36k
Income - Endowments £0
Income - Investment £506.14k
Income - Other £5.04k
Income - Legacies £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £549.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £160.44k
Expenditure - Governance £46.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0
Expenditure - Investment management £52.13k
Expenditure - Other £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2023
Own use assets £701.84k
Long-term investments £12.30m
Other assets £887.33k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0
Total liabilities £100.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Gatehouse
St. Johns Hospital
Northgate
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 1BG
Phone:
02072225381
Website:

No information available