GAND AID UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the organisation are to raise funds through sponsorships and donations in both raising and increasing the awareness and effects of GAND. The focus will be providing advocacy and support to families receiving a diagnosis and setting up a UK GAND community to help tackle the challenges that families will experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
gene Selby Self | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Johnson OBE | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Brian Carney | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Selby | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY OR SUFFERING FROM GATAD2B-ASSOCIATED NEURODEVELOPMENTAL DISORDER (GAND) AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: • PROVIDING ADVICE, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SERVICE DOGS • RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT GAND AND PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION • FUNDING RESEARCH INTO GAND INCLUDING EARLY IDENTIFICATION AND POSSIBLE TREATMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CARR HEAD
NEW BARN LANE
ROSSENDALE
BB4 7AQ
- Phone:
- 07594014532
- Email:
- GANDAIDUK@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window