THE NORTH WINGFIELDS MINERS' RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Genaral charitable purposes,social intercourse,mutual helpfullness,sport and recreation,education and training,subsidised meals. We provide grants to footballteams junior and senior,pool team,snooker team,judo club,Darby & Jones.We provide buildings and facilities for them to operate. We help children/young people,elderly people and the general public and mankind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Arthur Byard | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Richard Ward | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £4.06k | £33.24k | £12.98k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.79k | £8.71k | £10.68k | £15.83k | £33.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £600 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2021 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE PARISH OF NORTH WINGFIELD OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTH WINGFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH WINFIELD MINERS WELFARE
1 WILLIAMTHORPE ROAD
NORTH WINGFIELD
CHESTERFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S42 5PD
- Phone:
- 01246851750
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window