PALTERTON WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Palterton Miners Welfare - Welfare operated in Palterton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 May 1965: Standard registration
- PALTERTON MINERS WELFARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCARCLIFFE PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65k | £29.35k | £17.27k | £9.53k | £13.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.92k | £10.73k | £4.75k | £5.03k | £14.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.17k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2023 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1294 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/05/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PALTERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BACK LANE
PALTERTON
CHESTERFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S44 6UN
- Phone:
- 01246240495
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window