THE SAMPSON PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 520495
Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Playing field

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £2,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PILSLEY PARISH COUNCIL Trustee 12 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.00k £3.20k £3.20k £2.09k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Allendale Road
Wingerworth
Chesterfield
S42 6PX
Phone:
01246469695
Website:

WWW.PILSLEYPARISHCOUNCIL.ORG.UK