HAMSTERLEY AND LOW WESTWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further or benefit the residents of Hamsterley and Low Westwood and the neighbourhood, without prejudice or discrimination to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation to improve the conditions of life for the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £31,781 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 16 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Ross | Chair | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doris May Freeman | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cornforth | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Fraser | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY WILSON | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Thomas Drummond | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW MADDEN | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Drummond | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HAMSTERLEY AND LOW WESTWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 AXFORD TERRACE
HAMSTERLEY COLLIERY
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE17 7PB
- Phone:
- 01207438465
- Email:
- hamsterleylwca@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window