SHIREBROOK MINERS' WELFARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provisional of a recreation ground and Welfare institute for the benifit of the inhabitants (and in particular, but not exclusively , such of the said inhabitants as are members of the mining community) of the area of benefit without distinction of the political, religious or other opinions with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitiants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 November 1972: Standard registration
- SHIREBROOK MINERS WELFARE SOCIAL CENTRE (Working name)
- SHIREBROOK MINERS WELFARE AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IVAN FRISBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David John Bearder | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hinchley | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Cann | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN PAUL BLETCHER | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN CANN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.99k | £164.49k | £188.92k | £169.19k | £171.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.26k | £84.57k | £223.99k | £138.67k | £207.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. IN SO FAR AS THE...ASSETS OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE [ABOVE] OBJECT...THEN PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE CONSULTED AND OBTAINED THE AGREEMENT OF THE TRUSTEES OF CISWO (THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION, REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1015581) IN ADVANCE, THE TRUSTEES MAY USE THE CHARITY'S LAND AND OTHER ASSETS FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW FOR THE DIRECT BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF SHIREBROOK, OR SUCH OTHER AREA ETC (SEE SCHEME FOR DETAILS).
Linked charities
- 06 November 1972 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIREBROOK MINERS WELFARE
CENTRAL DRIVE
SHIREBROOK
MANSFIELD
NG20 8BA
- Phone:
- 01623742351
- Email:
- smwcentre@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window