THE ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM OF HONITON

Charity number: 1200249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The stated object of the Museum is to collect, care for and display artefacts, documents and other material (including our world famous collection of Honiton Lace) which has relevance to Honiton, its surrounding district and its inhabitants. Its principal aim is to make the collection available and accessible to the public, thus giving an insight into the history of the local area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Anne Connett Chair 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
PAULA SUSAN LAND Trustee 05 March 2025
DEMENTIA FRIENDLY HONITON
Received: On time
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
David Charles Lewis Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
DEMENTIA FRIENDLY HONITON
Received: On time
Linnette Cray Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
MARGARET LEWIS Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
STEPHEN PAUL PARSONS Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST AIRFIELDS HERITAGE LTD
Received: On time
MARY WARDELL Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time
VALERIE IRENE FOSS Trustee 01 September 2022
ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2023
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM OF HONITON
HIGH STREET
HONITON
EX14 1PG
Phone:
0140444966