PRINCES RISBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A part of the Baptist Union of Great Britain we hold regular worship services and weekly activities to teach and promote the Christian faith within our town. We also support a range of other Charites through regular giving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £230 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Leslie Leinweber | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Whittred | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Brownlie | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Lishman RGN RM | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hirst BEd Hons | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Gabbott BSc Hons | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gabbott BA, MSc | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £230 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 3.2 [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRINCES RISBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH
42 BELL STREET
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
HP27 0AD
- Phone:
- 01844274499
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window