GURLS TALK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Camilla Ann Lowther OBE | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Poppy Angela Delevingne | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Judith Ojiyovbi Koloko | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 APR 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) PROMOTING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ADOLESCENT GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN AND ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESILIENT INDIVIDUALS; (B) ACTING AS A RESOURCE AND PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR THE SHARING OF IDEAS AND CONVERSATIONS AROUND MENTAL HEALTH AND GENDER; (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE SOCIETAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL CHALLENGES EXPERIENCED BY ADOLESCENT GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN; AND (D) CARRYING OUT, PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE NEEDS OF SUCH YOUNG WOMEN AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O STUDIO 133, 222 KENSAL ROAD
LONDON
W10 5BN
- Phone:
- 02089696956
- Email:
- ben@hiltonconsulting.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window