SOUTH WINGFIELD MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
South Wingfield Social Club is continuing to be a viable and vibrant company, who continues to buck the trend and are not afraid to diversify to remain a solid financial company. Our commitment to remain so, is more than ever strong. we have this year increased out members base, but also open for none members to attend our club. we look forward to next year and the challenges ahead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 May 1965: Standard registration
- SOUTH WINGFIELD MINERS WELFARE CLUB (Working name)
- SOUTH WINGFIELD MINERS' WELFARE CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Bowler | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue McDowell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Walker | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GLYN SHEPHERD | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.96k | £6.12k | £6.61k | £7.19k | £10.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £6.09k | £3.67k | £4.70k | £8.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 December 2023 | 416 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10 JANUARY 1925
Charitable objects
RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN OR ABOUT COAL MINES IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SOUTH WINGFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 High Road
43 High Road
South Wingfield
ALFRETON
Derbyshire
DE55 7LX
- Phone:
- 07894844983
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window