THE BROCKLEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brockley Society aims to promote high standards of planning and architecture; to educate the public in the geography, history, culture and architecture of the area; to protect, develop and improve features of historic interest; and to promote good quality, innovative development. As a community group we aim to promote and improve the social, economic and environmental well-being of the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £2,400 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lewisham
Governance
- 02 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
URSULA CLARE COWEN | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Johnson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE GODDARD | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Cunningham | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Joseff Thomas | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Geoffrey Freeston | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE BROCKLEY CONSERVATION AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, CULTURE AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE BROCKLEY CONSERVATION AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OR AREAS OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE BROCKLEY CONSERVATION AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ESTABLISH A NEIGHBOURHOOD FORUM FOR THE BROCKLEY CONSERVATION AREA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM TO PROMOTE AND OR IMPROVE THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND ENVIRONMENTAL WELL-BEING OF THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 TYRWHITT ROAD
LONDON
SE4 1QB
- Phone:
- 02086923829
- Email:
- chair@brockleysociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window