ASSOCIATION OF SENIOR CHILDREN'S AND EDUCATION LIBRARIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASCEL works with all governmental, professional and other organisations and individuals, including children and young people themselves, in order to promote the value and awareness of library and information services for young people; We develop policies and strategies and training opportunities for the membership to be able to enhance and sustain library services for CYP and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 2022: CIO registration
- ASCEL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNABEL SUSAN ALICE GITTINS | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sherilyn D Pereira | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ann Ellis | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Edward Freeman MBE | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Shaw | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fuller | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fabienne Tannoh | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Haninah Simon BEM | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gail Ball | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Anna Louise Simmons | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Myhill | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Krystal Ann Vittles BEM | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.92k | £264.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.29k | £189.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE LITERACY IN YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES PRIMARILY BY ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE, OPERATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF LIBRARIES AND LIBRARY SERVICES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IMPROVING THE OVERALL STANDARD OF LIBRARIES AND LIBRARY SERVICES, AND BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN LIBRARIANSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wolverhampton Central Library
Snow Hill
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 3AX
- Phone:
- 01902539199
- Email:
- info@ascel.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window