THE FRIENDS OF HOW CAPLE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of How Caple Church run events in How Caple Church to encourage its greater use by the community in How Caple and nearby. We have a monthly parent and child event and organise bring and buy sales, gift fairs, choral recitals, churchyard maintenance and flowers. The money raised is used to support those activities and the fabric of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 28 March 2023: Standard registration
- FHCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilda Lee | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Aldrich Blake | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Perks | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUN 2019 ADOPTED 23 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE CHURCH OF ST ANDREW AND ST MARY AT HOW CAPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO MAINTAINING, PRESERVING, AND IMPROVING THE HISTORIC CHURCH BUILDING AND ITS CONTENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOW CAPLE COURT
HOW CAPLE
HEREFORD
HR1 4SX
- Phone:
- 01989740378
- Email:
- FriendsHCC@outlook.com
- Website:
-
friendsofhowcaplechurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window