CITY OF SOUTHEND JEWISH COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is the prevention or relief of poverty by making grants and/or purchasing specific items or services of need amongst those who identify themselves as being members of the Jewish faith within the City Of Southend and an outlying radius of 15 miles from the City Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 03 November 2022: CIO registration
- COSJCS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BERG | Chair | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Saul Jeremy Caplan | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Israel Geoffrey Hyman | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY MAKING GRANTS AND/OR PURCHASING SPECIFIC ITEMS OR SERVICES OF NEED AMONGST THOSE WHO IDENTIFY THEMSELVES AS BEING MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH WITHIN THE CITY OF SOUTHEND AND AN OUTLYING RADIUS OF 15 MILES FROM THE CITY CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Moat End
Southend-on-Sea
SS1 3QA
- Phone:
- +447908055738
- Email:
- info@cosjcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window