SERENDIPITY CREATIVE WRITERS' GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a mental health charity open to everyone; We provide a warm safe space for people to meet together, reducing loneliness and isolation, to write creatively about generic exercises (very much user led), although you do not have to be able to write. We talk and share experiences. Our two hour workshops and refreshments are free. We aim to improve mental health and aid better quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 02 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathy Trout | Chair | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Shepherd | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mira Fadel | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rhodes | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, POOR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN YORKSHIRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUPPORTED OPPORTUNITIES TO EXPLORE AND PRACTISE CREATIVE WRITING
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 FENAY LANE
ALMONDBURY
HUDDERSFIELD
HD5 8UL
- Phone:
- 07751254609
- Email:
- soniazoref@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window