KC01 LIMITED

Charity number: 1202616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of KC01 Limited is to restore the fabric and grounds of Kinloch Castle to original (circa1910) condition, revitalise the grounds with new planting and preserve the castles unique contents. The Trust will also provide funds for maintenance and sustainability of above objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,850
Total expenditure: £1,935

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY JOHN HOSKING Chair 28 March 2022
ROYAL SCOT LOCOMOTIVE & GENERAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOSKING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Catherine Mary Donaghy Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Angus John Tulloch Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.85k
Total expenditure £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sixth Floor
Capital Tower
91 Waterloo Road
London
Phone:
02073069100
Website:

No information available