THE JANE AUSTEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation exists to celebrate the nineteenth century British author Jane Austen by: promoting the appreciation and study of the life, work and times of Jane Austen and her family; preserving the manuscripts, letters and memorabilia of Jane Austen and her family; continuing a programme of scholarly publications; and supporting the work of Jane Austen's House, Chawton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 September 2022: CIO registration
- 29 April 2024: Funds received from 1040613 THE JANE AUSTEN SOCIETY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Irene Thomas | Chair | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Dorothy Clarke | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY CLARE HOGG | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||
FIONA HEATHER SHEILA AINSWORTH | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fiona Riley | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Stephen Kenning BA | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN STILLER | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £391.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF JANE AUSTEN AND THE AUSTEN FAMILY, IN PARTICULAR BY PUBLICATIONS OR ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY DEEM APPROPRIATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 PARSONAGE ROAD
HENFIELD
BN5 9JG
- Phone:
- 01273494210
- Email:
- hq@jasoc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window