THORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,021 from 9 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 07 June 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Gunn | Chair | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Taft | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Woodall | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bailey | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gunn | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Frith | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL CHALLINOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARKE LOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £10.89k | £18.36k | £17.00k | £23.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £1.59k | £1.39k | £5.30k | £50.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | £16.42k | £15.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20 JANUARY 1967 AS AMENDED 22 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THORPE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Digmire Lane
Thorpe
Ashbourne
DE6 2AW
- Phone:
- 01335
- Email:
- thorpevhbookings@gmail.com
- Website:
-
To_follow
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window