THE HEALING HARBOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Brennan | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Brennan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sally Revell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NRS JAQUELINE SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THOSE PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS IN NORTH NORFOLK WHO ARE LIVING WITH A LIFE-LIMITING OR PALLIATIVE CARE DIAGNOSIS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF: A) A SENSORY 'HEALING' GARDEN B) A RANGE OF HOLISTIC THERAPIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO HORTICULTURE, REFLEXOLOGY AND MUSIC; C) WORKSHOPS IN ADVANCE LIFE CARE PLANNING AND PALLIATIVE CARE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 WATERBANK ROAD
SHERINGHAM
NR26 8RB
- Phone:
- 01263478126
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window