THAMES OPERA COMPANY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the promotion of the arts for the benefit of the public through the presentation of dramatic and other arts in particular opera. For the advancement of education of the public in dramatic and other arts, predominantly in the Thames Gateway area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Kent
- Thurrock
Governance
- 23 November 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew David Smith | Chair | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Claire McDonach | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Hamilton | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allen Newton Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 DEC 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF DRAMATIC AND OTHER ARTS IN PARTICULAR OPERA. 4.2 FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DRAMATIC AND OTHER ARTS, PREDOMINANTLY IN THE THAMES GATEWAY AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Bakery
The Green
West Tilbury
TILBURY
Essex
RM18 8TU
- Phone:
- 01375855562
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window