Financial history WHALEY BRIDGE MECHANICS INSTITUTION

Charity number: 520533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.62k £27.69k £23.49k £25.83k £26.14k
Total expenditure £22.72k £20.96k £28.66k £32.39k £44.84k
Income from government contracts £9.21k £5.48k £4.45k £8.26k £7.35k
Income from government grants £3.30k £21.17k £8.00k N/A N/A